This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 08:51:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS DILLARD

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DILLARD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

DILLARD, CHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: CHERYL DILLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.