This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:16:01 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (usa), N.a. VS Dillard

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Capital One Bank usa , N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dillard. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.

Defendant

Dillard, Cheryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

SENDEROVICH, NATHAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.; Awarded Against: Dillard, Cheryl; Amount; Damages: $2,770.32; Costs: $310.36; Total: $3080.68; Party: Names: Capital One Bank (usa), N.a.; Dillard, Cheryl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: AND NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AGAINST CHERYL DILLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: CHERYL DILLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.