This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 19:04:57 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A., ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A , ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0261

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A., ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.

Defendants

LOPEZ ALVAREZ, ISIDRO

LOPEZ, ISIDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER, ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A., ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.; LOPEZ, ISIDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ISIDRO LOPEZ AKA ISIDRO LOPEZ ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A., ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.; Served: 09/29/20172:33 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less