This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:11 (UTC).

CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.VS MARIE VILLAGOMEZ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIE VILLAGOMEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6335

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANON FINANCIAL SERVIES INC

Defendant

VILLAGOMEZ, MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUERRINI, JOHN D

Attorney at GUERRINI LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ELECTRONICALLY ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CANON FINANCIAL SERVIES INC (PL-1). Received from THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM, check no(s) 32173. Receipt #726125 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO MARIE VILLAGOMEZ DBA ECUAPRINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • 844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for CANON FINANCIAL SERVIES INC (PL-1). Received from CANON FINANCIAL, check no(s) 30953. Receipt #711323 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Notice of Sister State Judgment Issued - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Sister State Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Application for Sister State Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less