Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:09 (UTC).

CANCIOBELLO VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 CANCIOBELLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0448

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANCIOBELLO, LUZ

Defendant

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, CRAIG E

Defendant Attorney

DUNBAR, KEVIN T E

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

09/16/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: j/t & fcmc set 10/17/16 9am dept 11 t/e 4 to 5 days; Parties Present Plaintiff: CANCIOBELLO, LUZ

Ruling

Ruling 09/13/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOHNSON, CRAIG E; Defendant; Attorney: DUNBAR, KEVIN T E

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC rule 3.1385 (Set per MO dated 09/16/16)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice. Filed by Craig E. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Ruling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause hearing be re-set for December 5, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., in department 11. ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE**** 11/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Certificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: t/e 4-5 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Waiver - Comment: Canon Waiver signed by all parties at Mandatory Settlement Conference on 09/16/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - 09/16/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: j/t & fcmc set 10/17/16 9am dept 11 t/e 4 to 5 days; Parties Present Plaintiff: CANCIOBELLO, LUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG E. JOHNSON, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: /Notice of Order to Show Cause/Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Peremptory Challenge - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Filed by Craig E. Johnson, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MESSENGER SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less