Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:41 (UTC).

CAMPBELL VS DIAZ

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 CAMPBELL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIAZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0978

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL, AMANDA

Defendant

DIAZ, CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Minute Order- UD Order to Show Cause 10/21/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Unlawful Detainer:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Order Dismissing Action (Full) As to Amanda Campbell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Order Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice - Comment: pursuant to local rule 3.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Minute Order- UD Order to Show Cause 10/21/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAMPBELL, AMANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAMPBELL, AMANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 5301 DEMARET AVENUE, #31, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "C"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK AS TO AMANDA CAMPBELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO AMANDA CAMPBELL.

    Read MoreRead Less