This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 13:55:45 (UTC).

CALL VS MORGAN-CALL (D)

Case Summary

On 04/12/2013 CALL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORGAN-CALL D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R., Compton, James L., Fielder, John L., Brehmer, Charles R. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4901

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Compton, James L.

Fielder, John L.

Brehmer, Charles R.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALL, WILSON

Defendant

MORGAN - CALL, HELEN

Respondent

MORGAN-CALL, HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Defendant Attorney

STANLEY, HEATHER J C

Attorney at LAW OFC HEATHER J C STANLEY

Respondent Attorneys

MCATEE, FRED S, II

KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Other Attorneys

BITTLESTON, DAWN

Attorney at BITTLESTON LAW

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 01/10/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE COUNSELS ONLY PICK TRIAL DATE PET PROP CNTRL. EST 5 DAYS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *TO BE HEARD @ 1:30*; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MORGAN-CALL, HELEN; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TRIAL DATE 8/28-08/31 AT 1:30 P.M. EST 4 DAYS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Further Status Conference

Further Status Conference 09/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC- TEMPORARY JUDGE; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MORGAN-CALL, HELEN; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET PROP CNTRL CONT'D FROM 3/2/17 *1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MORGAN-CALL, HELEN; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TRIAL DATE 08/28 -08/31. AT 1:30 P.M.m. EST: 4 DAYS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MORGAN-CALL, HELEN; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Request for Order - Respondent

Original Type: Request for Order - Respondent; **MO - Continuance 2/8/2016 Canceled: February 08, 2016 8:30 AM Request for Order - Respondent: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES PROP CNTRL STMNT OF DEC

Court Trial

Court Trial 08/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4 day estimate 08/28-08/31 - day 1 at 1:30 p.m.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: MORGAN-CALL, HELEN; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketRelease of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/10/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Comment: JUDGE MARCOS R. CAMACHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketJudgment on Reserved Issues - Judicial Officer: Officer, Other Judicial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: MICHAEL A CARLOVSKY ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOath - Comment: OF OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: RE CERTIFICATION OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AND OATH OF OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Status Conference - Further Status Conference 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: STATUS PARTIES STIP

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketNP1080 - Comment: Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: EX PARTE HEARING. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: WILSON CALL (PE-1) APPEARS WITH DAWN BITTLESTON. HELEN MORGAN-CALL (RE-1) APPEARS WITH HEATHER J C STANLEY ESQ. RESPONDENT'S COUNSEL FILED 170.6 AGAINST JUDGE FIELDER THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JAMES L COMPTON FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Docket4037 Ex Parte - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET STAY AWAY ORDERS PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS RETURN ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Original Type: Ex Parte Hearing; Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PET STAY AWAY ORDERS PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS RETURN ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: PET HRG: 4/17/13 1100AM DIV.MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketPetition for Nullity - Comment: NO MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Docket123A Pmt: Court Reporting Services in Civil Proceeding - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for CALL, WILSON (PE-1). Received from WILSON CALL, check no(s) 7083. Receipt #712523 for amount of $120.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Docket172F Pmt: Motion/Stip/OSC/Demurrer GC 70617(A) - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for CALL, WILSON (PE-1). Received from WILSON CALL, check no(s) 7083. Receipt #712523 for amount of $120.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for CALL, WILSON (PE-1). Received from WILSON CALL, check no(s) 7083. Receipt #712522 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 160

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BITTLESTON, DAWN O