Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:50:07 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC. VS PINA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PINA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC.

Defendants

PINA, ROSSANA

ISHII, ROSSANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC.; PINA, ROSSANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice entire action and all causes of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: RE: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Michael K. Sipes Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less