This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 06:13:59 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC VS GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUZMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1379

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC

COLLECTO, INC. DBA EOS-CCA

Defendant

GUZMAN, AMELIA

Assignee

COLLECTO, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

SIPES MICHAEL K

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/29/2015: Complaint

Declaration

07/29/2015: Declaration

Summons Issued and Filed

07/30/2015: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

07/30/2015: Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause

07/30/2015: Order to Show Cause

Declaration

07/29/2015: Declaration

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/29/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Rejection/Correction Notice

12/22/2015: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

01/21/2016: Rejection/Correction Notice

Notice of Change Name/Address

01/27/2016: Notice of Change Name/Address

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

01/27/2016: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

01/27/2016: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

Declaration

01/27/2016: Declaration

Judgment by Default by Clerk

01/28/2016: Judgment by Default by Clerk

Memorandum of Costs

03/18/2016: Memorandum of Costs

Writ Returned Unsatisfied

05/28/2019: Writ Returned Unsatisfied

Assignment of Judgment

04/06/2021: Assignment of Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Assignment of Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - COLLECTO, INC. DBA EOS-CCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ Returned Unsatisfied; Comment: Writ issued 4/25/2016 Kern

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Abstract Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Kern County/Returned via mail; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Clerk; Comment: AS TO AMELIA GUZMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: OF MICHAEL K SIPES IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment; Comment: AS TO AMELIA GUZMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Change Name/Address; Comment: AS TO MICHAEL K SIPES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, AMELIA GUZMAN. 11/12/15; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, AS TO, AMELIA GUZMAN. 2ND REJECTION. CANNOT FILE AN AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE, WHEN AN ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN FILED.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, AS TO, AMELIA GUZMAN. 3A DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: OSC 360Hearing Date: 7/5/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: OSC 180Hearing Date: 2/1/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: OF MICHAEL K. SIPES RE: VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: FOR REDUCED FILING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL K. SIPES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU is a litigant

Latest cases where Collecto, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K