This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 09:01:17 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CITY REDEVELOPMENT VS NINA PLOTNER

Case Summary

On 07/08/2003 CALIFORNIA CITY REDEVELOPMENT filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against NINA PLOTNER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Kelly, John I. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0610

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Kelly, John I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CITY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Defendants

PLOTNER, NINA

TOLEDO, JOE

DELACRUZ, RUBEN M

ROWEN, MARY

JONATHON FINANCIAL CORPORATION

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

NATHAN, JACK

MARTINEZ, MAX C

PATTERSON, LONNIE

WEINGAST, EDWARD

SAFECO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

KILPATRICK, CARROLL

TOLEDO, HORTENCIA

GIBRALTAR SAVINGS EQUITY RESOURCES II, INC.

AMERICAN WESTERN LAND INC

PLOTNER, PATRICK

CANU, BARBARA E.

EDGAR, ETHEL

GOLDEN STATE RESOURCES INC.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMSPOKER, TODD A

KUHS, ROBERT G

Defendant Attorney

ESKRIDGE, GAYLE L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: WITHDRAW OF CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ON REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 4/24/09: A JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED IN THIS CASE. CIVIL CLERK ALONE CANNOT PROCESS YOUR DISMISSAL IN THIS STATUS (MAILED VIA SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: FOR DISMISSAL OF AT&T CORPORATION FILED BY TODD A. AMSPOKER, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: FILED BY BYRON B. MAUSS, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • DocketOrder - Comment: FOR RELEASE OF DEPOSIT JUDGE KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2007
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: FOR ORDER FOR RELEASE OF DEPOSIT WITH STATE TREASURY; DECLARATION OF ANTHONY W BAGNETTE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION, DECLARATION AND PROPOSED JUDGMENTS/ORDERS OF CONDEMNATION RETURNED TO TODD AMSPOKER; IT APPEARS 250610 AND 250618 ARE BEING MIXED UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RE: APN 235-061-49 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT RETURNED TO TODD AMSPOKER - CASE NUMBER DOES NOT MATCH CASE NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS: MARION E LE MAY; YOUNG KO; KUM KO; YONG IL LEE; JUNG HAK LEE; CHUN MING CHANG; CECIL GRANT CLARK; WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY; N SCLUFER; DIAMOND H LAND INVESTMENT COMPANY; RALPH H SEYMER, JR; ROBERT H WESTERVEL; TITLE INSURANCE AND TRUST COMPANY; CALIFORNIA ARIZONA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, INC; MARSHALL REDMAN; DORIS REDMAN; LAWYERS TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED AS TO ANTHONY J CANU AND BARBARA E CANU: JUDGMENT WAS ENTERED ON 10/27/06. FILED BY ANTHONY W BAGNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • DocketNP1430 - Comment: Department: 9 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CALIFORNIA CITY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY (PL-1) APPEARS BY ROBERT G KUHS ESQ. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT'S OR COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT'S THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: CASE CONTINUES TO BE IN A STAYED BASES PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE VALIDATION CASES CURRENTLY ON APPEAL IN THE 5TH APPELLATE COURT DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
211 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action CONV; File Date: 07/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action CONV; File Date: 07/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action CONV; File Date: 07/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action CONV; File Date: 07/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action CONV; File Date: 07/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action CONV; File Date: 07/08/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: 01/19/2004 @ 8:00 A.M. IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketComplaint-Public Entity-FT - Comment: IN EMINENT DOMAIN: PARCELS NO. APNS 235-061-52; 235-040-15; 235-040-32; 235-040-44; 235-040-10; 235-040-29; 235-040-39; 235-040-46; 235-040-18; 235-040-36; 235-040-42; 235-040-22; 235-040-24; 235-040-25; 235-040-38 LIS PENDENS ISSUED THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2003
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 275

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITY UNION TITLE INSURANCECOMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CITY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant