Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:52 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE VS ORELLANA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ORELLANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0990

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE

Defendant

ORELLANA, MARIA Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON, LEE M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Maria Orellana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-26-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY LEE. M. MENDELSON CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less