Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:19:44 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE VS DEGUZMAN

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEGUZMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1062

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE

Defendant

DEGUZMAN, ELDA LUZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON, LEE M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference 01/12/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

4/4/16 MO: OSC RE: CRC Rule 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: To plaintiff's counsel Re: imposition of sanctions for failing to comply with CRC, Rule 3.110

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: cont'd from 4/4/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - 4/4/16 MO: OSC RE: CRC Rule 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: To plaintiff's counsel Re: imposition of sanctions for failing to comply with CRC, Rule 3.110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Order to Show Cause to plaintiff for failing to comply with CRC 3.110; 4/4/16, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Minute Order-Case Management Conference 01/12/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: DEFAULT ONLY AS TO ELDA LUZ DEGUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Elda Luz Deguzman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-28-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY LEE M. MENDELSON CMC 1-12-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less