This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:19 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS CRUSE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRUSE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0607

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CRUSE, LORI

CRUSE, SHIRLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, SUSAN H

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/5/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.