This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 08:46:21 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AGRI-SPRAYERS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BARBA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 CALIFORNIA AGRI-SPRAYERS, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BARBA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AGRI-SPRAYERS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BARBA, IRMA

DESSY & DESSY, APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVERETT, GERALD M

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, names listed on item 1.(b)(6) does not match complaint. If question number 2 is " The Court did not waive court fees" page two does not need to be completed. Please correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Gerald Leverett Re: Summons Reason:Please resubmit the Summons, it does not conform to the Complaint in regards to all of the Defendant Names. Thank you

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Gerald Leverett Re: Summons Reason:Please resubmit the Summons, it does not conform to the Complaint in regards to all of the Defendant Names. Thank you

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Good Cause appearing, Defendant, Irma Barba shall have until Friday, June 19, 2020 to file her first appearance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Good Cause appearing, Defendant, Irma Barba Shall have until Friday, May 22, 2020 to file her first appearance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Good Cause appearing, Defendant, Irma Barba shall have until Monday, April 6, 2020 to file her first appearance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to Dessy & Dessy, APC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, names listed on item 1.(b)(6) does not match complaint. If question number 2 is " The Court did not waive court fees" page two does not need to be completed. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Irma Barba via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/25/20205:36 PM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Gerald Leverett Re: Summons Reason:Please resubmit the Summons, it does not conform to the Complaint in regards to all of the Defendant Names. Thank you

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.