This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:21:16 (UTC).

CALDERON VS COMMERCE ENERGY INC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CALDERON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COMMERCE ENERGY INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6617

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDERON, MARIA

Defendants

COMMERCE ENERGY INC

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED ON 5/24/13 ~ calid=2205535 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:05/28/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:francesn, SystemDate:3/28/2013 3:37:52 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY LINDA Y H CHENG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO MARIA CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO COMMERCE ENERGY, INC (MAILED 3/28/13)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC (MAILED 3/28/13)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO MARIA CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPY AND FEE WAIVER GRANTED MAILED TO PLAINTIFF (3/28/13)

    Read MoreRead Less