This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 05:21:04 (UTC).

CACH V KREWEDL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2013 CACH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KREWEDL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3929

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

KREWEDL, MICHAEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AYERS, JONATHAN E

Neuheisel Law Firm 2277 Fair Oaks Blvd #305A

Sacramento, CA 95825

HARVEGO, DEBORAH S

TSAI, KIMBERLEE

BONIFACIUS, RACHEL

ZARCO, GLORIA

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: Remaining Balance: $15531.64

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: (El Dorado County)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: El Dorado County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Sacramento County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 10, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 10, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 11, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AD OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for CACH, LLC (pl-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 133872. Receipt #743385 for amount of $225.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 851

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEUHEISEL LAW FIRM, P.C. - JONATHAN E. AYERS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARVEGO, DEBORAH S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonifacius, Rachel W