This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 21:58:34 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS WEDERTZ

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEDERTZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0157

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

WEDERTZ, SHAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ETSELL, KAREN L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: FOR SHAWN WEDERTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: FOR SHAWN WEDERTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less