This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:24:33 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0067

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

TORRES, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERME, LISA M

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CACH, LLC; Awarded Against: TORRES, JOSE; Amount; Damages: $2,329.24; Attorney Fees: $582.31; Costs: $250.50; Total: $3162.05; Party: Names: CACH, LLC; TORRES, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less