This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 16:15:00 (UTC).

CACH, LLC, VS TORRES

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip", Phillips, Craig G. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0250

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC,

Defendant

TORRES, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ETSELL, KAREN L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice As To Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service As To Maria Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Electronic Document - Duplicate Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO MARIA TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/07/201711:56 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Suppport Of Reduced Filling Fee (Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1 (c)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less