This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 14:27:14 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS TORO

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TORO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0195

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

TORO, DALIA MELENDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERME, LISA M

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less