This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 12:23:46 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS SNOWDEN

Case Summary

On 01/10/2014 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SNOWDEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0629

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

SNOWDEN, SUZANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWERNEMANN, RACHEL C

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave #850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTONEY, MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 943761. Receipt #781255 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/RETURNED ORIGINAL VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: NO COPY/ENDORSED PROVIDED FOR RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=2455719 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:01/08/2015, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, SystemDate:1/17/2014 10:54:53 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: TOTAL $13,238.49 AS TO SUZANNE SNOWDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2014
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: BY PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO SUZANNE SNOWDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 08, 2015 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 08, 2015 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • Docket844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC, check no(s) 124773. Receipt #757962 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant