This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:20:34 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6168

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, MIREYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave #850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/ DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 152300. Receipt #827399 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP. FILED BY RYAN VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL, check no(s) 146629. Receipt #817263 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • NP1565 - Comment: Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT; FILED BY DEFENDANT, MIREYE RODRIGUEZ, IN PRO PER. HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DENNIS BERRY MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR RYAN E VOS ON BEHALF OF CACH, LLC (PL-1). MIREYA RODRIGUEZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** CASE TRANSFERRED FROM DEPARTMENT 12 FOR HEARING. DEPARTMENT 12 IS DARK. CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT IS DENIED. DEFENDANT DOES NOT ADVANCE A REASONABLE BASIS FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP SECTION 473(B). COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • 4061 Motion to Set Aside - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: 4/18/14 TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 4 FOR HEARING ONLY. DEPARTMENT 12 IS DARK. DEFENDANT, MIREYA RODRIGUEZ, IN PRO PER. MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT. ****************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION. DEFENDANT DOES NOT ADVANCE A REASONABLE BASIS FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP SECTION 473(b).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Motion to Set Aside - Original Type: Motion to Set Aside; Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Tentative Ruling: DENY MOTION. DEFENDANT DOES NOT ADVANCE A REASONABLE BASIS FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP SECTION 473(b). 4/18/14 TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 4 FOR HEARING ONLY. DEPARTMENT 12 IS DARK. DEFENDANT, MIREYA RODRIGUEZ, IN PRO PER. MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE JUDGMENT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DEFENDANT. ****************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION. DEFENDANT DOES NOT ADVANCE A REASONABLE BASIS FOR RELIEF UNDER CCP SECTION 473(b).; Parties Present Plaintiff: CACH, LLC; Defendant: RODRIGUEZ, MIREYA

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO MIREYA RODRIGUEZ SERVED 4/9/13 BY SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • 843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 104072. Receipt #709714 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF VENUE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less