Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:56 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1037

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE

RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZARCO, GLORIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CACH, LLC; Awarded Against: RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE; Amount; Damages: $6,322.14; Costs: $294.50; Total: $6616.64; Party: Names: CACH, LLC; RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO CHRISTINE RODRIGUEZ AKA CHRISTINE K RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Declaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to Christine Rodriguez AKA Christine K Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Amended Proof of Service - Comment: personal, as to Christine Rodriguez aka Christine K Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Christine Rodriguez aka Christina K. Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY GLORIA ZARCO

    Read MoreRead Less