This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:20:23 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS RAMOS

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6162

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

RAMOS, CLAUDIA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave #850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=2205408 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/24/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:3/28/2013 2:43:34 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: RYAN VOS MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP 6301 OWENSMOUTH AVE., STE 850 WOODLAND HILLS CA 91367 RE: CACH, LLC VS RAMOS Case No. S-1500-CL-276162, LSE NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS XX The attached CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE papers are being returned for the following reason(s): THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF A DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 12/12/13. THE CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE WAS RECEIVED 9/6/13 AND HAD NOT YET BEEN PROCESSED. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: RYAN VOS MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP 6301 OWENSMOUTH AVE., STE 850 WOODLAND HILLS CA 91367 RE: CACH, LLC VS RAMOS Case No. S-1500-CL-276162, LSE NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS XX The attached CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE papers are being returned for the following reason(s): THE COURT IS IN RECEIPT OF A DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 12/12/13. THE CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE WAS RECEIVED 9/6/13 AND HAD NOT YET BEEN PROCESSED. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: W/O PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 10/7/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2205406 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/07/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/28/2013 2:43:12 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO CLAUDIA C RAMOS SERVED 4/9/13 BY SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • 843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 104070. Receipt #709719 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF VENUE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less