This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:14 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS LOVE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOVE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1807

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

LOVE, SHYENNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ, LORENA O

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN/VIJ RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CACH, LLC; Awarded Against: LOVE, SHYENNE; Amount; Damages: $2,479.30; Costs: $250.50; Total: $2729.80; Party: Names: CACH, LLC; LOVE, SHYENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: As to Shyenne Love

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Accepting copies in lieu of original.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO SHYENNE LOVE, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less