This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:20:40 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS KAMBOJ

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KAMBOJ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6170

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

KAMBOJ, VIJAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave #850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2015
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY MADARICH LAW GROUP LLP. FILED BY RYAN E VOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Court Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: T/E: 2 HOURS T/E: 2 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: CT/FCMC 04-16-14 (D-12) T/E 2 HOURS CT/FCMC 04-16-14 (D-12) T/E 2 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/25/2013 ~ calid=2365935 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4147, CourtDate:04/16/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:7, SessionType:CTC, Judge:LSE, SystemDate:9/30/2013 1:55:24 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Judgment - Comment: AGAINST DEFENDANT, VIJAY KAMBOJ **ETIENNE**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • NP1750 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ANDREW BRISENO MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR RYAN E VOS ON BEHALF OF CACH, LLC (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** CAUSE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADINGS. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS THERE IS NO OPPOSITION. MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS GRANTED. ORDER IS SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • 4116 Motion for Judgment - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: 9/4/13 PLAINTIFF, CACH, LLC MOITON FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Motion for Judgment - Original Type: Motion for Judgment; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: 9/4/13 PLAINTIFF, CACH, LLC MOITON FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; Parties Present Plaintiff: CACH, LLC; Defendant: KAMBOJ, VIJAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Notice - Comment: OF HEARING CMC & COURT TRIAL FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO VIJAY KAMBOJ SERVED 4/6/13 BY SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • 843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 104074. Receipt #709712 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF VENUE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less