This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:20:43 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS DOUGLAS

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOUGLAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6171

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

DOUGLAS, ROBERT C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave #850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=2205695 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/24/2014, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/28/2013 4:30:32 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=2205693 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:10/07/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ryanb, SystemDate:3/28/2013 4:30:11 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. FILED BY RYAN VOS, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO ROBERT C DOUGLAS 3 ATTEMPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: #2 INCOMPLETE. (ABC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • 843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 104068. Receipt #709711 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF VENUE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less