This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:20:26 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS CADENA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CADENA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6163

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

CADENA, DEBORAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

6301 Owensmouth Ave #850

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2016
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: As to Debotah Cadena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Notice of Change Name/Address - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP. FILED BY RYAN VOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF: KERN RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, check no(s) 944891. Receipt #784800 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: FILED BY: RYAN VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: WRIT - REQUESTED PREMATURELY, PREVIOUS WRIT ISSUED 10/21/13 RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC, check no(s) 937995. Receipt #767882 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2013
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO DEBORAH CADENA 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • 843X Pmt: Small Claims First Paper File by Assignee w/in SC - Comment: Amount of $181.00 for CACH, LLC (PL-1). Received from ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC., check no(s) 104069. Receipt #709717 for amount of $181.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF VENUE FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: OF REDUCED FILING FEEFILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY RYAN E VOS

    Read MoreRead Less