This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 16:55:03 (UTC).

CABRERA VS CABRERA RAMOS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2015 CABRERA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CABRERA RAMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K. and Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2067

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CABRERA, MARIZA ROA

Respondent

CABRERA RAMOS, VICTOR FERNANDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order to Restore Name - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: CABRERA, MARIZA ROA; CABRERA RAMOS, VICTOR FERNANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: PETITION AND SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image:MARIZA ROA CABRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.