This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:14:24 (UTC).

CABRERA ET AL VS PENA, Jr. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CABRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PENA, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2507

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CABRERA, ANGEL

CABRERA, YESENIA

Defendants

PENA, JUAN, Jr.

CITY OF WASCO, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF WASCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERGENER, JAMES M

MAZZA, STEVEN L

Defendant Attorney

PEAKE, LARRY F

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of change of handling attonrey rejected. Case was dismissed on 3/19/2018 filed by attorney Steven Mazza. Returned via USPS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ryne Osborne isnot listed as an attorney of record for the plaintiff in this case. Returned via AMS

Ruling

Ruling 04/14/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 03/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Petition for Order (Pre-Disposition) 01/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: renewed Petition for Order Relieving Plaintiff from Claim Filing Requirements or an Order that there has been substanial compliance.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Petition

01/13/17 - M.O. PETITION FOR ORDER: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Filed 12/14/16, by Plaintiff, Yesenia Cabrera. Petition for Order Relieving Plaintiff from Government Entity Claim Filing Requirements, or in the Alternative, for an Order that Plaintiff has Substantially Complied with said Requirements. ResID: 23513.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Petition rejected in File & Serve

Petition

11/22/16 - PETITION FOR ORDER FOR RELIEF FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 945.4: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 10/31/16, by Plaintiffs, Yesnia Cabrera and Angel Cabrera. Petition for Relief from Tort Claims Act by the City of Wasco. ResID: 18244; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F; Defendant; Attorney: PEAKE, LARRY F

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/06/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Jury trial requested by plaintiff; 8-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: trial requested by plaintiff; 8-10 days; JT 04/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of change of handling attonrey rejected. Case was dismissed on 3/19/2018 filed by attorney Steven Mazza. Returned via USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: JT 04/30/18 in D-11; 8-10 days; jury requested by plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Entire action is dismissed with prejudice. Returned via ams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ryne Osborne isnot listed as an attorney of record for the plaintiff in this case. Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Docket998 Offer - Comment: Statutory offer to compromise pursuant to CCP section 998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service - JP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service - JP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: RE: Notice of Hearing - Duplicate Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 11/22/16 Hearing Time: 830 am Dept: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: RE: Notice of Hearing Missing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/06/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF PETITION AND PETITON FOR ORDER RELIEVING PLAINTIFF YESENIA CABRERA FROM GOVERNMENT ENTITY CLAIM FILING REQUIREMENTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAS SUBSTANTIALLY COMPLIED WITH SAID REQUIREMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less