This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 09:33:49 (UTC).

BURTCH VS MAXIMUS

Case Summary

On 02/22/2013 BURTCH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MAXIMUS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8748

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURTCH TRUCKING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BURTCH CONSTRUCTION

Defendants

MAXIMUS III COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OM MANAGEMENT & BUSINESS ASSOCIATES, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CITY OF DELANO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

OM MANAGEMENT & BUSINESS ASSOCIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAUN, CRAIG D

Attorney at KLEIN DENATALE GOLDNER COOPER ROSENLIEB & CO

Law Ofc Craig D Braun 1620 Mill Rock Way #400

Bakersfield, CA 93311

Defendant Attorney

OKADIGBO, CHAKA C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ENTERED ~ calid=2173524 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:08/21/2013, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:4/30/2013 11:32:10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FILED BY CRAID D BRAUN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: THE LAW FIRM OF GCR LLP HAS CHANGED ITS NAME TO GARCIA HERNANDEZ SAWHNEY & BERMUDEZ. THE ADDRESS PHONE NUMBER AND FACSIMILE NUMBER WILL REMAIN THE SAME FILED BY CHAKA C. OKADIGBO, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: AS TO MAXIMUS III COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 8/21/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 8/21/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: CITY OF DELANO S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, QUANTUM MERUIT AND TO FORECLOSE MECHANIC S LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: 6/7/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2173521 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:06/07/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:teresag, SystemDate:2/25/2013 8:30:04 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2013
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG D BRAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CITY OF DELANO SERVED 3/7/13 BY SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO OM MANAGEMENT & BUSINESS ASSOCIATES, INC SERVED 3/6/13 BY SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BURTCH TRUCKING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG D BRAUN, check no(s) 1124. Receipt #704108 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA CRAIG D BRAUN ATTY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 07, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY CRAIG D. BRAUN CMC 8/21/13 800AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: REAL PROPERTY 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 609

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURTCH CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where BURTCH TRUCKING, INC. DBA BURTCH CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF DELANO is a litigant