This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:54:22 (UTC).

BUMGARNER VS BUMGARNER

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 BUMGARNER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BUMGARNER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0084

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUMGARNER, DIANE

Respondent

BUMGARNER, TOM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Returned Default to Diane Bumgarner (pick up drawer): FL-141, FL-170 #4 & FL-165 #3b incomplete; addresses on FL-190 must match envelopes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less