This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:53 (UTC).

BUCHANAN VS BITTLE

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 BUCHANAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BITTLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9003

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCHANAN, JASMIN LYNN

Defendant

BITTLE, CASSIE ANN MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, JOHN C

Attorney at LAW OFC JOHN C HALL

1200 Truxtun Ave #114

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Defendant Attorney

WELLS, DAVID J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 9/23/13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED, REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED ~ calid=2204857 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4153, CourtDate:09/23/2013, Courtroom:11, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:CCM, Judge:DRL, Deputy:GRICELDAE, SystemDate:5/1/2013 11:45:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION, FILED BY DAVID J WELLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • 801N First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BITTLE, CASSIE ANN MARIE (DE-1). Received from DEUTINGER, AHARONIAN & WELLS, check no(s) 05042. Receipt #715859 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Notice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 9/23/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULED HEARING DATE(S) BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 11 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "DRL" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE DAVID R LAMPE ON 9/23/2013 AT 8:30 A.M.. IN DEPARTMENT 11 OF THIS COURT. PARTIES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTIFYING COURT CALL OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Answer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY DAVID WELLS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: 7/10/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING VACATED, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=2204865 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/10/2013, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:GRICELDAE, SystemDate:3/28/2013 11:03:51 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CASSIE ANN MARIE BITTLE SERVED 4/10/13 PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BUCHANAN, JASMIN LYNN (PL-1). Received from JOHN C.HALL, check no(s) 27212. Receipt #709624 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 10, 2013 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY JOHN C. HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY JOHN C. HALL

    Read MoreRead Less