This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 03:48:14 (UTC).

BSFF INC. VS CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 06/18/2015 BSFF INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R., Errea, Larry A., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0020

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Errea, Larry A.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BSFF INC.

Defendant

CHAVEZ, LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

mo-ud2: Judicial Officer(s): Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN; Defendant: CHAVEZ, LORENA

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BSFF INC.; MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN; Awarded Against: CHAVEZ, LORENA; Must Pay; Other: $2,000.00; Total: $2,000.00; Party: Names: BSFF INC.; CHAVEZ, LORENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketAgreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - mo-ud2: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: AND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Hearing Date: 07/30/2015 Hearing Time: 1:30 P.M. Hearing Department/Division:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: REGARDING NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO LORENA CHAVEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO LORENA CHAVEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketAnswer (Verified)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BSFF INC.; Served: 06/20/201511:35 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2425 JASMINE ST WASCO, CA 93280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.