This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:53:13 (UTC).

BRYANT VS JONES

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 BRYANT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0248

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRYANT, CARL

Respondent

JONES, RAYSHON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF PETITION WITH EX PARTE COMMUNICATION LETTER,; AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Family Law Documents - Requested By: BRYANT, CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less