Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 07:18:03 (UTC).

BRUCE VS TURNER(DAVIS)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 BRUCE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against TURNER DAVIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2394

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRUCE, MARISSA

Respondent

TURNER(DAVIS), TIFFANY JOY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketTo ensure the public has access to court proceedings - Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: POS / TRO DENIED / RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: as to Tiffany Turner , by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: AS TO TIFFANY JOY TURNER (DAVIS) PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (CH-250) - Comment: AS TO MARISSA BRUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Restraining Order (CH-120)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: as to Tiffany Turner ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: hrg : 11/9/20 @830am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: No Temporary Order Issued ***No Judicial Officer Signature***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BRUCE, MARISSA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less