This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:28 (UTC).

BROWN VS VALADEZ

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VALADEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Pritchard, Kenneth G., Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn, Schuett, Stephen D. and Brehmer, Charles R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0569

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Schuett, Stephen D.

Brehmer, Charles R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, DATHAN

Defendant

VALADEZ, AUGSTIN

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 11/04/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

Ruling

Ruling 11/01/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 10/26/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Managment Conference 04/27/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Party: Names: BROWN, DATHAN; VALADEZ, AUGSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR DATHAN BROWN-MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: AUGSTIN VALADEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Managment Conference 04/27/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of Filing Remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Remittitur on Appeal After Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 11/04/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 11/01/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 10/26/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: -per clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less