This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 09:14:37 (UTC).

BROWN VS CORONEL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2014 BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CORONEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3131

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, ANDREW

Defendants

CORONEL, MIGUEL

EIEL MERICH PAYNE INTL. DRILLING

HELMERICH & PAYNE

HELMERICH & PAYNE INTERNATIONAL DRILLING CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLAN, MICHAEL P

Attorney at LAW OFC MICHAEL P DOLAN

1315 "L" St

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Defendant Attorney

AGHABEG, DENA S

 

Court Documents

Motion to Permit

**MO - Public motion to permit: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/23/16 Defendant, HELMERICH & PAYNE INTERNATIONAL DRILLING CO. and MIGUEL CORONEL Motion to Permit Defendants' Client Representative to Participate Telephonically at March 25, 2016 Mandatory Settlement Conference ResID: 14382; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DOLAN, MICHAEL P; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S

Mandatory Settlement Conference

3/25/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC/JURY TRIAL 04/11/16 (D17) TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS; Parties Present Plaintiff: BROWN, ANDREW; Attorney: DOLAN, MICHAEL P; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

**MO - Public ex parte application: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Immediate Consideration of Defendants' Motion in Limine no. 1, filed by Defendants Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co. and Miguel Coronel; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: DOLAN, MICHAEL P; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S

Trial Setting Conference

05/17/16 MO - TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: trial was set for 04/11/2016. estimate 5 days; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S

Mandatory Settlement Conference

09/16/16 MO: Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 9-30-16; JURY TRIAL 10-11-16 (D-17) T/E 5 DAYS; Parties Present Plaintiff: BROWN, ANDREW; Attorney: DOLAN, MICHAEL P; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S; Defendant; Attorney: AGHABEG, DENA S

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

**MO dismissal w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: COUNSEL FTA ON 11/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 11/29/2016 AND FAILING TO FILE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: ***THOMAS S CLARK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - **MO dismissal w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, ITEM #1.B IS INCOMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E: 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2015
  • Docket4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: (DOCUMENTS RETURNED BY MAIL) TO: MICHAEL DOLAN LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL DOLAN 1315 L S TREET BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 RE: BROWN VS CORONEL Case No. S-1500-CV-283131, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS The attached PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS MIGUEL CORONEL; HELMERICH AND PAYE; AND EIEL MERICH PAYNE INT DRILING are being returned for the following reason(s): RE: MIGUEL CORONEL SUBSTITUTED SERVICE: Substituted service requires proof declaration of due diligence showing the attempts to locate party RE: MIGUEL CORONEL MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE: Need proof of certified mail and receipt of the same Need mark box # 4 on # 5 (c) RE: HELMELRICH AND PAYNE MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE: Need proof of certified mail and receipt of the same Need mark box # 4 on # 5 (c) RE: EIEL MERICH PAYNE INT. DRILLING MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE: Defendant's name is does not match summons and complaint Need proof of certified mail and receipt of the same Need mark box # 4 on # 5 (c) Calendar Notes: TO: MICHAEL DOLAN LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL DOLAN 1315 L S TREET BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 RE: BROWN VS CORONEL Case No. S-1500-CV-283131, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS The attached PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS MIGUEL CORONEL; HELMERICH AND PAYE; AND EIEL MERICH PAYNE INT DRILING are being returned for the following reason(s): RE: MIGUEL CORONEL SUBSTITUTED SERVICE: Substituted service requires proof declaration of due diligence showing the attempts to locate party RE: MIGUEL CORONEL MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE: Need proof of certified mail and receipt of the same Need mark box # 4 on # 5 (c) RE: HELMELRICH AND PAYNE MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE: Need proof of certified mail and receipt of the same Need mark box # 4 on # 5 (c) RE: EIEL MERICH PAYNE INT. DRILLING MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE: Defendant's name is does not match summons and complaint Need proof of certified mail and receipt of the same Need mark box # 4 on # 5 (c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: MICHAEL P. DOLAN, ESQ. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 4/3/2015 @ 8:15 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BROWN, ANDREW (PL-1). Received from MICHAEL P. DOLAN, check no(s) 914. Receipt #803015 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: MICHAEL P. DOLAN LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL P. DOLAN 1315 L STREET BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 RE: BROWN VS CORONEL Case No. S-1500-CV-283131, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. PARTY NAMES ON SUMMONS, CAPTION OF COMPLAINT AND BODY OF COMPLAINT MUST MATCH. PARTY NAME IN BODY OF COMPLAINT IS NOT CONSISTENT WITH SUMMONS AND CAPTION ON COMPLAINT. NAME, ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OR PLAINTIFF WITHOUT ATTORNEY IS INCOMPLETE ON SUMMONS . ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: MICHAEL P. DOLAN LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL P. DOLAN 1315 L STREET BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 RE: BROWN VS CORONEL Case No. S-1500-CV-283131, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. PARTY NAMES ON SUMMONS, CAPTION OF COMPLAINT AND BODY OF COMPLAINT MUST MATCH. PARTY NAME IN BODY OF COMPLAINT IS NOT CONSISTENT WITH SUMMONS AND CAPTION ON COMPLAINT. NAME, ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OR PLAINTIFF WITHOUT ATTORNEY IS INCOMPLETE ON SUMMONS . ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 21, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 21, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL P. DOLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL P. DOLAN CMC SET 4/3/15 @8:15AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABEG DENA S.