Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:07:41 (UTC).

BROWN VS BROWN (C)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 BROWN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BROWN C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M., Fielder, John L., Bittleston, Dawn and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4044

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Fielder, John L.

Bittleston, Dawn

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROWN, JANE MILLS

Respondent

BROWN, LEVI MILLER

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 PET DV/TRO CARE OF ANIMALS REIMBURSMENT; Parties Present Petitioner: BROWN, JANE MILLS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Comment: HRG 10/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 PET DV/TRO CARE OF ANIMALS REIMBURSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 10/25/2017 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less