This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 19:29:58 (UTC).

BROWN ET AL VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2204

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN, DUSTIN

BROWN, SAMANTHA

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CALIFORNIA DEPT. OF TRANSPORATION

HALL, TED JAY

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ, CONNIE A

NGUYEN, MINH T.

Defendant Attorney

KNOX, JEFFREY B

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/04/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Connie Rodriguez Re: Order on Motion to Quash Reason: Please indicate when the hearing took place and attach proof of service.

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 01/28/2020: CORRECTED Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 01/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/23/19 Plaintiffs Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Medical Records ResID: 36711

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Connie A. Rodriguez, Re: Stipulation to Continue Trial, per phone conversation wiht Arroyo Law, Inc. Filing is being rejected, a proposed order was not included in the filing. A proposed order needs to be filed separate from the Stipulation. The Clerk is unable to separate the proposed order from the stipulation.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Please remove the proposed order scanned behind the Stipulation. if you are adding it as an exhibit, please mark it as an exhibit. Returned via efile

Ruling

Minute Order 01/25/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 08/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/3/18 Defendant, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Plaintiffs Dustin Brown and Samantha Brown ResID: 31365

Ruling

Ruling 08/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Order rejected in File and Serve

Ruling

Ruling 03/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Connie Arroyo Rodriguez Second Amended Complaint Must seek leave of court for the filing of a second amended complaint.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT; SUMMONS MUST MATCH THE COMPLAINT WORD FOR WORD. PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Continued from 05/11/2020 by Standing Order;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Continued from 05/11/2020 by Standing Order; T/E 5 DAYS JURY FOR DEFENDANT, DEFENDANT POSTED JURY FEES (PLAINTIFF WAIVED JURY BY NOT POSTING JURY FEES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Continued from 04/03/2020 by Standing Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/04/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder on Motion - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: The Court having considered the Motion t0 Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Medical Records, the Court hereby makes the following order: Plaintiffs Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Medical Records - Granted in pan/Denied in part. Full and complete discovery of medical and billing records related to Plaintiff Dustin Brown's claimed medical conditions of bilateral shoulder pain, shoulder rotator cuff tendinosis, left shoulder surgery, back pain, neck pain, disc herniations, PRP injections, spinal injections, occipital nerve blocks, persistent headaches, concussions, and brain cerebellar tonsillar herniation, and any and all documents related to his use and prescriptions of the following medications: Percocet, Ambien and Cyclobenzaprine. Full and complete discovery of Plaintiff Samantha Brown's relevant medical and billing records related to her claims of injury to her back, shoulder, forearm, hand, fingers, disk protrusions, right leg, cervical and lumbar radiculopathy, right shoulder surgery, back surgery, emotional distress, depression, and PTSD, and any and all documents related t0 her use and prescriptions of the following medications: Percocet, Gabapentin, and Xanax. Billing time frame: 03/02/2017- forward only. (See reporter's transcript for full ruling)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Connie Rodriguez Re: Order on Motion to Quash Reason: Please indicate when the hearing took place and attach proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) - Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 01/28/2020: CORRECTED Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 01/28/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/23/19 Plaintiffs Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Medical Records ResID: 36711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement - Comment: in support of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Medical Records

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: POS OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: POS OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: POS OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT; SUMMONS MUST MATCH THE COMPLAINT WORD FOR WORD. PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/08/2017; Served: 12/08/2017; Served: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less