This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 22:23:16 (UTC).

BROOKS VS BROOKS

Case Summary

On 05/06/2016 BROOKS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROOKS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Woodward, Cory J. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0141

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Woodward, Cory J.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROOKS, ROBERT JOE

Respondent

BROOKS, DANIELLE ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: BROOKS, ROBERT JOE; BROOKS, DANIELLE ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.