This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 04:36:16 (UTC).

BRIGHT VS MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2013 BRIGHT filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0439

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRIGHT, MICHAEL

BOJORQUEZ, HERNAN

BOJORQUEZ, MARIA I.

CAY, VICTOR MICHAEL

HEDLUND, ROBERT

HEDLUND, LINDSEY

HINOJOSA, FRED

JOHNSON, KERI

LEWIS, ZACHARY

MAHAR, MICHAEL

MAHAR, NATALIE

MANABAT, EDITH R.

MANABAT, CONRADO P.

FAMA - MARTINEZ, JAVIER

PARRA, MARIBEL

MONSIBAIS, MANUEL

MOSHREF, WEISS

MOSHREF, NILUFAV

NEWTON, HAROLD

NEWTON, IGNACIA

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

Attorney at SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1810 State St

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

BLAKE, KIMBERLY A

KENNEDY, KEVIN P

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

PEZOLD, DANIEL G

STEAD, CALVIN R

ELLIOTT, DEBORAH L

ARABI, ARASH S

MALCOLM, STACEY L

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

EBNER, DARREN M

THOMASIAN, ELIZABETH A

HAZELTON, M TROY

MCELROY, JULIE D

BOARDMAN, NORA R

ROCHLIN, MATTHEW A

CRAWFORD, DAVID

NAKAGAWA, EDWIN S

CRESPO, DANIEL A

MCCLAIN, ROBYN S

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 11/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: PLEASE CONTACT CLERK.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER & AMENDMENT: PARTY ANSWERING IS NOT A NAMED PARTY IN THE CROSS-COMPLAINT. AMENDMENT HAS NOT BEEN EXECUTED BY THE COURT.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: PARTY ANSWERING IS NOT A NAMED PARTY TO MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 12/02/2016

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: LAW OFFICE OF JOHN HAUSER HAS FILED AN ANSWER FOR ALL AMERICAN CARPET INC. ON 11/14/16.

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Public CMC: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FEES POSTED BY BOTH; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J

Case Management Conference

cmc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Cross Complainant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 5-26-15: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE; APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; ITEM 1.B.6 IS NOT AN INDIVIDUAL PARTY TO THE CASE.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; NO DOCUMENTATION THAT BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA WAS FORMERLY BROUGHT INTO THE CASE. CANNOT ASSOCIATE ANOTHER ATTORNEY WHEN YOU WERE NEVER FORMERLY ADDED AS AN ATTORNEY FOR CROSS DEFENDANT REED PAINTING & DECORATING, INC.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & NOTICE OF DEMAND: PARTY BEING NAMED ON NOTICE OF APPEARANCE IS NOT A NAMED PARTY ON CROSS-COMPLAINT. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; ITEM #1.B.3 NAME OF CROSS-COMPLAINT IS INCORRECT. THE CORRECT NAME OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/16 IS MCMILLIN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.

Further Case Management Conference

**MO -cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 2 CONTINUES CMC FROM 9/23/16 TO 12/02/16

Further Case Management Conference

06/14/2016 Minute Order: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Defendant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R; Cross Complainant; Attorney: STEAD, CALVIN R

Further Case Management Conference

CV280439 MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: & Proof of Service As to Cross Complaint, Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Attorney Calvin R Stead Re: Request for Dismissal Reason: We already received and filed request for Dismissal for Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Calvin R Stead Re: Request for dismissal Reason: Per conversation will resubmit with the correct cross defendant names answered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to the Complaint only WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to Guinn Corporation FKA Irv Guinn Construction only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to X- Complaint McMillin Tuscany, LLC, et al., Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice As to Entire Case As to Cross Complaint McMillin Management Services LP

    Read MoreRead Less
681 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MCMILLIN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SUB SERVICE 12/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO MCMILLAN TUSCANY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SUB SERVICE 12/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: LORI J. GUTHRIE, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: Amount of $1,000.00 for BRIGHT, MICHAEL (PL-1). Received from MICHAEL BRIGHT, check no(s) 305628. Receipt #742511 for amount of $1,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BRIGHT, MICHAEL (PL-1). Received from MICHAEL BRIGHT, check no(s) 305627. Receipt #742510 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: LORI J. GUTHRIE VIA ACS RE: BRIGHT VS MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC Case No. S-1500-CV-280439, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: LORI J. GUTHRIE VIA ACS RE: BRIGHT VS MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC Case No. S-1500-CV-280439, LHB NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached SUMMONS papers are being returned for the following reason(s): X Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 15, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 15, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY LORI J. GUTHRIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY LORI J. GUTHRIE CMC SET 4/1/2014 @8:15AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details Page 1 of 3

Print this page

Case # S1500CV280439 - BRIGHT VS MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC (Clark, Thomas S.)

% S1500CV280439

: BRIGHT VS MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC ® Clark, Thomas S.

. Nora Boardman

: Law Offices of John A. Hauser

Robert T Defilippis E §5.15

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF KERN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

MICHAEL BRIGHT, et al., )} CASE NO. S-1500-CV-280439-LHB ) Plaintiffs, ) CROSS-DEFENDANT, JORGE ) DIAZ,ROE 7, ANSWER TO vs. ) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ) MCMILLIN TUSCANY, LLC,ET McMILLIN TUSCANY, LLC, et al,, ) AL. ) Defendants. ) JUDGE: HON. THOMAS S. CLARK ) DEPT: DEPT: 17 AND ALL RELATED CROSS ACTIONS. ) ) Date Action Filed: Trial Date:

COMES NOW, Cross-Defendant, JORGE DIAZ, ROE 7 (hereinafter “cross-defendant™), and answers the unverified Cross-Complaint of MCMILLIN TUSCANY, LLC, ET AL. (hereinafter “cross-complainants”™), by alleging as follows:

1. Pursuant to Section 431.30 of the California Code of Civil Procedure, this cross- defendant denies each and every material allegation contained in the Cross-Complaint, and further specifically denies the cross-complainants have been damaged in the sum or sums alleged, or in any other sum or sums or at all, by any action or omission on the part of this

answering cross-defendant.

answering cross-defendant. Calvin R. Stead, Esq.; SBN 129358 BORTON PETRINI, LLP

Calvin R. Stead, Esq.; SBN 129358 BORTON PETRINI, LLP

5060 California Avenue, Suite 700 Post Office Box 2026

Bakersfield, California 93303-2026 Tel: (661) 322-3051

Fax: (661) 322-4628 cstead@bortonpetrini.com

Attomneys for MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, MCMILLIN TUSCANY VILLAS LLC, MCMILLIN PORTOLA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, MCMILLIN, VENECIA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, MCMILLIN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP., a California Limited Partnership, CORKY MCMILLIN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC., a California Corporation, CENTRAL VALLEY RESIDENTIAL BUILDERS, L.P, a California Limited Partnership, BAKERSFIELD RESIDENTIAL BUILDERS, L.P., a California Limited Partnership

O 66 ~1 O W b W N

— b e N e O

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF KERN, METROPOLITAN DIVISION MICHAEL BRIGHT, an individual, et al., Case No. Case No. S-1500-CV-280439-LHB Plaintiffs, AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

NAMING ROE 7 AS JORGE DIAZ AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

—_— N W

MCMILLIN TUSCANY LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, et al.,

Defendants.

& 8 = I

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS.

K O /11 270111 284711/

R\Public\0557 '

60068341 - 1 D S