Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:00:16 (UTC).

BRENES VS BRENES

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 BRENES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRENES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1671

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRENES, APRIL R

Respondent

BRENES, JESSIE L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 8/22/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less