This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 16:42:32 (UTC).

BRAVO VS WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 BRAVO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1952

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAVO, JOSEFINA ALDACO

Defendants

WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC, A DELAWARE COMPANY

SHP MANAGEMENT CORP., AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

WASCO ARMS APARTMENTS

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC

HAMPSTEAD WASCO ARMS PARTNERS LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E

Defendant Attorneys

MAXWELL, KELSEY L A

MORRIS, ASHLEY R

MORENO, RICHARD C

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/08/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service: Item 3.b. for both Proofs of Service are missing a name listed for Authorized Agent able to Accept Service. Please review.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: continued from 12/08/2021 - AS TO DEFENDANT SHP MANAGEMENT ONLY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: continued from 12/08/2021 - AS TO DEFENDANT SHP MANAGEMENT ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Ashley Morris New Attorney: Kelsey Maxwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Fairstead Affordable LLC, a Delaware company via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service: Item 3.b. for both Proofs of Service are missing a name listed for Authorized Agent able to Accept Service. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 10/08/202111:27 AM; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/08/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS ASHLEY RAE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO RICHARD C.