This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 07:27:21 (UTC).

BRAVO VS MADRIGAL(E)

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 BRAVO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MADRIGAL E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3652

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRAVO, LAURA

Respondent

MADRIGAL, ALEX

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAMPKIN, ROGER N

Respondent Attorney

SOUTH, BRUCE E

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 09/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/16/2018 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT 3 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO, LAURA; Respondent: MADRIGAL, ALEX

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/16/2018 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 9/10/18; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO, LAURA; Respondent: MADRIGAL, ALEX; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketResponse to Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney:BRUCE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 10/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/16/2018 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 9/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: IN PRO PER New Attorney: RIGER LAMPKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: EXP 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STEPHANIE CHILDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 09/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/16/2018 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: Court Referral / Div E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: DV SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILDERS, STEPHANIE