This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 03:03:44 (UTC).

BRAVO VS MADRIGAL (E)

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 BRAVO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MADRIGAL E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M., Webster, Jason W., Foley, Therese M., Loo, Cynthia L. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3777

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Webster, Jason W.

Foley, Therese M.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAVO

Petitioner

BRAVO, LAURA

Defendant

MADRIGAL(E)

Respondent

MADRIGAL, ALEX

Minors

COUNSEL, MINOR

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LAMPKIN, ROGER N

GRASS, ROGER R

Respondent Attorney

SOUTH, BRUCE E

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate 10/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Respondent: MADRIGAL, ALEX; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner

Order to Show Cause - Petitioner 11/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/16/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT (FILED IN BFL-18-3652)*DV DISSOLVED ON 10/15/18* 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/15/2018; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO, LAURA; Respondent: MADRIGAL, ALEX; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 12/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/16/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT (FILED IN BFL-18-3652)*DV DISSOLVED ON 10/15/18* 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/15/18 11/7/18; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO, LAURA; Respondent; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/16/18 PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL (FILED IN BFL-18-3652)*DV DISSOLVED ON 10/15/18* 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/15/18 11/7/18 12/05/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Respondent; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/16/18 PET C/C C/V PROP CNTRL (FILED IN BFL-18-3652)*DV DISSOLVED ON 10/15/18* 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/15/18 11/7/18 12/05/18 01/22/19; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/22/19 CONTD FROM 3/13/19; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Respondent: MADRIGAL, ALEX; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/22/19 CONTD FROM 3/13/19 5/22/19; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO, LAURA; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Respondent: MADRIGAL, ALEX; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: SET FROM 1/22/19 CONTD FROM 3/13/19 5/22/19 7/24/19; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Respondent; Attorney: SOUTH, BRUCE E; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Findings and Order after Hearing

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 12/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: SET FROM 1/22/19 CONTD FROM 3/13/19 5/22/19 7/24/19 09/25/19

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/25/2020: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: RESERVED ISSUES

Ruling

Ruling 03/24/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: RESERVED ISSUES CONTD FROM 2/25/20 6/03/20 7/06/20 7/29/20 9/22/20 11/05/20 **STATUS**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: COPY OF JUDGMENT- RESENT TO RES ADDRESS ON ORDER REMOVING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: COPY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 12/09/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT- MISSING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. ENVELOPE #5351030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: E-FILED: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Comment: HRG 11/05/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 09/28/20 RES ATTYN BRUCE SOUTH TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: DEFAULT HAS BEEN SET ASIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/16/18 PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROP CNTRL/RSTNT (FILED IN BFL-18-3652)*DV DISSOLVED ON 10/15/18* 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MADRIGAL(E) is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant

Latest cases where Bravo Companies Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILDERS, STEPHANIE