This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 02:23:54 (UTC).

BRAVO DE ARAIZA VS ARAIZA-ESPARZA (C)

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 BRAVO DE ARAIZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARAIZA-ESPARZA C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Stainfield, Bryan K., Gill, Susan M., Benavides, Jose R., Cannon, Gloria and Domnitz, Ronald D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1209

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Gill, Susan M.

Benavides, Jose R.

Cannon, Gloria

Domnitz, Ronald D.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA

BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA G

Respondent

ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CLOUD, BOBBY L

Respondent Attorney

RUBIO, NIEVES

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 7/06/17 AND 8/31/17 **OSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

Mandatory Settlement Conference 08/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: 9/02/15 PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 7/06/17 **STATUS ONLY** **MSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 3/09/17 AND 5/11/17 **OSC CAL ALSO**

Request for Order - Petitioner

4/11/16 MO: RESPONDENT PETITIONER SPOUSAL SUPPORT, CUSTODY, VISITATION, PROPERTY CONTROL & RESTRAIN: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CNTRL PROP RSTRNT CONT FROM 02/09/16; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA

Request for Order - Respondent

MO - 12/14/15: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES S/S CONTD BY GREEN STIP FROM 11/3/15; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

Minute Order for 9/28/15 RFO-PET: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CTRL PROP RESTRAINT CONTD FROM 7/6/15 & 8/10/15; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Ex Parte Hearing

ex parte m/o: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES EX-PARTE C/C C/V MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL/RESTRAINT 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

(2) MO - PET RFO / RESP RFO: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CTRL PROP RESTRAINT CONTD FROM 7/6/15; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - PET RFO / RESP RFO: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CTRL PROP RESTRAINT 2MINORS; Parties Present Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 7/06/17 8/31/17 10/19/17 11/30/17 1/11/18; Parties Present Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 7/06/17 8/31/17 10/19/17 11/30/17; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 9/02/15 PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 7/06/17 AND 8/31/17 **STATUS ONLY** **MSC CAL ALSO**; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 05/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/26/15 RES S/S CONT'D FROM 3/14/17; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA

Request for Order - Respondent

1/10/17 MO REQUEST FOR ORDER RESPONDENT/PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: RES S/S CONT'D FROM 11/01/16 **STATUS ONLY**

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 11/01/2016: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT CONT'D FROM 9/27/16 **STATUS ONLY**; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Request for Order - Petitioner

04/29/16 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOTION TO BIFURCATE; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA; Respondent: ARAIZA-ESPARZA, SAMUEL

Ex Parte Hearing

EX PARTE M/O: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX-PARTE C/C C/V MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL/RESTRAINT 2 MINORS CONTINUED FROM 9/1/15 FILE IN DIV C; Parties Present Petitioner: BRAVO DE ARAIZA, MARIA

Ex Parte Hearing

EX PARTE (RESP): Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES EX PARTE CC CV MOVE OUT PROP CNTRL/RESTRAINT 2 MINORS CONT'D FROM 8/27/15

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment on Reserved Issues - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 12/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/10/18 NOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketTrial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: HRG 11/28/17 NO COPIES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: CT 12/03/18 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES OST HRG DATE: 7/6/15 DIV.C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: OST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER- OST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: IN PRO PER New Attorney: NIEVES RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET HRG DATE: 7/6/15 DIV. C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.