This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 09:33:01 (UTC).

BRANDON VELAZQUEZ, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ON BEHALF OF ALL SIMILARLY SITUATED INDIVIDUALS VS PRECISION ALMOND HARVESTING LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 BRANDON VELAZQUEZ, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ON BEHALF OF ALL SIMILARLY SITUATED INDIVIDUALS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PRECISION ALMOND HARVESTING LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDON VELAZQUEZ, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ON BEHALF OF ALL SIMILARLY SITUATED INDIVIDUALS

Defendant

PRECISION ALMOND HARVESTING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATOFSKY, ALEX P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/03/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Precision Almond Harvesting LLC, a California limited liability company, via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/20/20222:43 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/03/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATOFSKY ALEX