This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:17:32 (UTC).

BRAL VS BIAS

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 BRAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BIAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0123

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAL, TONY

Defendant

BIAS, JAMIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BRAL, TONY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 410 F St Taft, CA 93268; Awarded Against: BIAS, JAMIE; Party: Names: BRAL, TONY; BIAS, JAMIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original via In Pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Jamie Bias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Jamie Bias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BRAL, TONY; Served: 11/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 410 F ST TAFT, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less