This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 10:57:22 (UTC).

BRADLEY VS WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 BRADLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0066

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

BRADLEY, BRITTNEY JANE

BRITTNEY JANE BRADLEY AND INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MORGAN BRADLEY, AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

WILLIAMS, JUSTIN ALLAN

THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CO., A CA CORP.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DE FOREIGN STOCK CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

RONHAAR, LEAH K.

Defendant Attorneys

SHAHBAZIAN, MELINA

WALSH, DANIEL C.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leah Ronhaar Re: Letter to Court regarding a Petition for Compromise, Each individual case will need its own Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action. The order Approving Compromise of Pending Action for case BCV-18-100174 does not pertain to case BCV-18-100066. A Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action will need to filed for case BCV-18-100066. Returned via e-file

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Please submit a letter to the court why a Petition to Approve the compromise of a pending action or proceeding in which a minor/person with a disability has not been filed. Returned via efile

Ruling

Ruling 04/19/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 02/13/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/10/2018. pending Probate matter

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leah Ronhaar Document: Second Amended Complaint Proposed Second Amended Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leah Ronhaar Document: Second Amended Complaint and Proposed Summons Must seek leave of court for second amendment of complaint.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Leah Ronhaar, Esq. Date of Letter: May 21, 2019 Re: Request for Dismissal and Petition to Approve the Compromise of a Pending Action or Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leah Ronhaar Re: Letter to Court regarding a Petition for Compromise, Each individual case will need its own Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action. The order Approving Compromise of Pending Action for case BCV-18-100174 does not pertain to case BCV-18-100066. A Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action will need to filed for case BCV-18-100066. Returned via e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Please submit a letter to the court why a Petition to Approve the compromise of a pending action or proceeding in which a minor/person with a disability has not been filed. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 04/19/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: THE COURT ORDERS that Plaintiff may file her second amended complaint. ***JUDGE THOMAS S. CLARK***1-29-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leah Ronhaar Document: Second Amended Complaint and Proposed Summons Must seek leave of court for second amendment of complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Morgan Bradley is appointed guardian ad litem for Brittney Jane Bradley (endorsed copy returned via investigative services of bakersfield 1-25-18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: on First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/26/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address): : FOR COURT USE ONLY Leah Ronhaar, Esq. SBN 283276 Bradley, Drendel & Jeanney | 6900 South McCarran Blvd Suite 2000 Reno, NV 89509 TELEPHONE NO: (775) 335-9999 FAX NO. (Optional): ('775) 335-9993 E-MAIL ADDRESS {Optional): ATTORNEY FOR (Namoy: Plaintiff SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN streeTanoress: 1415 Truxton Ave #212 manng apoRess: 1415 Truxton Ave #212 crvanp zipcooe: Bakersfield 93301 srancHnave: Kern PLAINTIFF: Brittney Jane Bradley, an individual, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Morgan Bradley, an individual DEFENDANT: Justin Allan Williams, Ford Motor Company, a DE - foreign stock corp, Three-Way Chevrolet Co. a CA corp poes1T0 50 COMPLAINT—Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death AMENDED (Number): TWO Type (check all that apply): [~ ] MOTORVEHICLE [v] OTHER (specify): Products Liability [__] Property Damage [ _] Wrongful Death v ] Personal Injury ] Other Damages (specify): Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER:

] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [__| does not exceed $10,000 BCV-18-100066

[ exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 'ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) [_] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint [ 1 from limited to uniimited (] from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff (name or names): Britiney Jane Bradley, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Morgan Bradley alleges causes of action against defendant (name or names): Justin Allan Williams, Ford Motor Company, Three-Way Chevrolet Co. 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 6 3. Each plaintiff named above is a competent aduit a. except plaintiff (name): Brittney Jane Bradley (1) (] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [ a public entity (describe): 4) ] aminor [ v ] an adult (@) [~] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad htem has been appointed (b) [ other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify): b. [_] except plaintiff (name): (1) (1 a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) (] a public entity {describe): (4) (] aminor [_] an adult (@) ] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [C_] other (specify): (5) [_] other (specify):